WV SB529 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 16, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 16, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying provisions of Nonintoxicating Beer Act
Title
Clarifying provisions of Nonintoxicating Beer Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 427) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 535) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 204) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 535) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 204) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 16, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 427) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 535) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2019-02-27 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-25 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 204) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-05 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3100 (Similar To) 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 11b | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 16 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 6b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 6c | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 16 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
11 | 16 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |