WV SB539 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 198, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 198, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to accrued benefit of retirees in WV State Police Retirement System Plan B
Title
Relating to accrued benefit of retirees in WV State Police Retirement System Plan B
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 530) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 609) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 223) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 609) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 223) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 198, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 530) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 609) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-26 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 223) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | To Pensions |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-06 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3070 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10D | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |