WV SB544 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to municipal policemen's and firemen's pension and relief funds
Title
Relating to municipal policemen's and firemen's pension and relief funds
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Kessler [D] | Sen. Orphy Klempa [D] |
Sen. Brooks McCabe [D] | Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Herb Snyder [D] | Sen. Erik Wells [D] |
Sen. Mark Wills [D] | Sen. Jack Yost [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 128, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-04-05 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/23/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/23/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/11 | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-11 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-11 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) | |
2011-03-11 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 5) | |
2011-03-11 | House Message received | |
2011-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 299) | |
2011-03-10 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 298) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-07 | With amendment, do pass | |
2011-03-03 | To House Finance | |
2011-03-03 | To Finance | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House | |
2011-03-02 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-02 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 20) | |
2011-03-02 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 20) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-28 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-25 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-22 | On 2nd reading to Finance | |
2011-02-22 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-22 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-22 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-02-22 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-02-18 | To Pensions | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | To Pensions then Finance | |
2011-02-18 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 3 | 14d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22A | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |