WV SB544 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 199, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 199, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing salaries for members of WV State Police over three-year period
Title
Increasing salaries for members of WV State Police over three-year period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 488) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 488) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 613) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 612) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 573) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 224) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 224) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 488) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 613) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 612) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 573) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 224) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 224) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 199, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 488) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 488) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 613) |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 612) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 573) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-26 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 224) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 224) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2885 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |