WV SB545 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 156, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 156, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing transfer of moneys from Insurance Commission Fund to Workers' Compensation Old Fund
Title
Authorizing transfer of moneys from Insurance Commission Fund to Workers' Compensation Old Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Tarr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 417) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 417) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 451) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 450) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 125) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 417) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 451) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 450) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 125) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 156, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 417) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 417) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 451) |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 450) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-13 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-13 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 125) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-01-28 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-01-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 2C | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |