WV SB546 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 246, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 246, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health care provider taxes
Title
Creating tax on certain acute care hospitals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 389) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 389) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 489) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 488) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 206) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 206) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 389) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 489) (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 488) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 206) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 206) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 246, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 389) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 389) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 489) |
2019-03-06 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 488) |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-25 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 206) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 206) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-14 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |