WV SB55 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to driving privileges and requirements for persons under 18
Title
Relating to driving privileges and requirements for persons under 18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 28) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-29 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 28) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17B | 2 | 3a | Amended Code | Citation Text |