WV SB554 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to termination, expiration, or cancellation of oil or natural gas leases
Title
Relating to termination, expiration, or cancellation of oil or natural gas leases
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Charles Clements [R] | Sen. John Pitsenbarger [R] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 368) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 424) (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 424) (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/13/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/20 |
2020-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 368) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 424) |
2020-02-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-29 | House | From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2020-02-29 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2020-02-21 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | To House Energy |
2020-02-17 | House | To Energy then Judiciary |
2020-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 144) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2020-01-31 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining then Judiciary |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |