WV SB558 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certification requirements for crane operators
Title
Relating to certification requirements for crane operators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 217) (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-02-28 | House | To Government Organization |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 217) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 2/22/18 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Government Organization |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Workforce |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-15 | Senate | To Workforce then Government Organization |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 3D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 3D | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |