WV SB560 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 261, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 261, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting nursing home use trained individuals administer medication
Title
Permitting nursing home use trained individuals administer medication
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 219) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 148) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 167) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 158) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 70) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 148) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 167) (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 158) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 70) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 261, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 |
2020-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/28/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-28 | Senate | To Governor 2/28/20 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-18 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 219) |
2020-02-18 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 148) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 167) |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-12 | House | Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 158) |
2020-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2020-02-06 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-06 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 70) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-21 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-21 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4423 (Similar To) 2020-01-20 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5AA | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5AA | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7D | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |