WV SB561 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 17, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 17, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting Alcohol Beverage Control Administration request assistance of local law enforcement
Title
Permitting Alcohol Beverage Control Administration request assistance of local law enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 556) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 742) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 490) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 617) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 574) (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 246) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 742) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 490) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 617) (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 574) (Y: 36 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 246) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 17, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 556) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with title amend, passed (Roll No. 742) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 490) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 617) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 574) |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2019-03-07 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 246) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3031 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 2 | 17a | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 2 | 17b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 6 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 7 | 8a | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 8 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 8 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 1 | 3ss | Amended Code | Citation Text |