WV SB564 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding comprehensive coverage for pregnant women through Medicaid
Title
Expanding comprehensive coverage for pregnant women through Medicaid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 489) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 618) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 275) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 618) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 275) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 489) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 618) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-06 | House | Do pass |
2019-03-02 | House | To House Finance |
2019-03-02 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-28 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 275) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2956 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - To House Banking and Insurance
SB559 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - To Health and Human Resources
SB559 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - To Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16B | 6d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 5 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |