WV SB565 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - Referred to Rules on 2nd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to residency requirements for deputy assessors
Title
Relating to residency requirements for deputy assessors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2827 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Chapter 65, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |