WV SB574 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting authorized physician order involuntary hospitalization of individual if physician believes addicted or mentally ill
Title
Permitting authorized physician order involuntary hospitalization of individual if physician believes addicted or mentally ill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 289) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-03-02 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-28 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 289) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Amended on 3rd reading (Voice vote) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Deferred until foot of 3rd |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |