WV SB581 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 92, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 92, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make technical corrections to the Uniform Trust Code.
Title
Relating generally to administration of trusts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 362) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 365) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 145) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 365) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 145) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 92, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-13 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 |
2017-04-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 362) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 365) |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 145) |
2017-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-03-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-11 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2978 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 1 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 1 | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 1 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
44D | 4 | 405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 4 | 414 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 5 | 503b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 5 | 505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 6 | 604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 8 | 813 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
44D | 8 | 817 | Amended Code | Citation Text |