WV SB596 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusting voluntary contribution amounts on certain DMV forms
Title
Adjusting voluntary contribution amounts on certain DMV forms
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 753) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 555) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 538) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 228) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 555) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 538) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 228) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 753) |
2019-03-09 | House | Conference report received-House |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 555) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To conference |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Weld, Sypolt, Jeffries |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House appointed conferees: Harshbarger, Phillips, Hartman |
2019-03-09 | House | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 538) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-26 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 228) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported by clerk |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/23/19 |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-13 | Senate | To Military |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Military |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17A | 2 | 12a | Amended Code | Citation Text |