WV SB62 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusting requirements for hiring school attendance directors
Title
Adjusting requirements for hiring school attendance directors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 110) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 89) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 89) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 68, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | Approved by Governor 2/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/21/18 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | To Governor 2/19/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-02-20 | House | To Governor 2/19/18 - House Journal |
2018-02-19 | Senate | To Governor 2/19/18 |
2018-02-15 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 110) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 89) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-01-23 | House | To House Education |
2018-01-23 | House | To Education |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-01-10 | Senate | To Education |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-10 | Senate | To Education |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |