WV SB62 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring participation in drug court program before discharge of certain first-time drug offenses
Title
Requiring participation in drug court program before discharge of certain first-time drug offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
2019-01-23 | House | To Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Judiciary |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 16) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-01-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-01-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2922 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 4 | 407 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60A | 4 | 407a | New Code | See Bill Text |