WV SB623 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 315, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 315, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing noncitizen of US be eligible for teaching certificate
Title
Allowing noncitizen of US be eligible for teaching certificate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 270) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 269) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 87) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 87) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 269) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 87) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 87) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 315, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/5/20 |
2020-02-28 | House | To Governor 2/28/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-28 | Senate | To Governor 2/28/20 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-21 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 270) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 269) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | To House Education |
2020-02-10 | House | To Education |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 87) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 87) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-24 | Senate | To Education |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-24 | Senate | To Education |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
18A | 3 | 1f | Amended Code | Citation Text |