WV SB624 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to administering ACT or SAT tests to 11th grade students
Title
Allowing county boards of education use alternative assessment provided in Every Student Succeeds Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 671) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 670) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 419) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 419) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 466) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 465) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 209) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 209) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 670) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 419) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 419) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 466) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 465) (Y: 86 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 209) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 209) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 671) |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 670) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message, |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 419) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 419) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 466) |
2019-03-05 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 465) |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | To House Education |
2019-02-25 | House | To Education |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2019 (Roll No. 209) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 209) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2E | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |