WV SB627 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to Rural Rehabilitation Loan Program
Title
Relating generally to Rural Rehabilitation Loan Program
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 627) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 626) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 231) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 231) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 626) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 231) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 231) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 10, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 627) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 626) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-06 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-26 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 231) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 231) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2964 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |