WV SB642 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing options in living wills and combined medical powers of attorney and living wills
Title
Providing options in living wills and combined medical powers of attorney and living wills
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 252) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 252) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 30 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |