WV SB667 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 87, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 87, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating WV Motorsport Committee
Title
Creating WV Motorsport Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 469) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 236) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 236) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 87, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 469) |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-26 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 236) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | No motion to Government Organization made |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Originating in Senate Economic Development |