WV SB669 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 234, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 234, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing appointment of comissioners to acknowledge signatures
Title
Allowing appointment of commissioners to acknowledge signatures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 537) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 635) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 257) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 635) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 257) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 234, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 537) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 635) |
2019-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-08 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2019-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 257) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 4A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 4A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |