WV SB674 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriation for Medical servcices to DHHR
Title
Supplemental appropriation to Division of Human Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 286) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 286) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 286) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 286) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 286) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |