WV SB675 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the Department of Environmental Protection to create and implement an Adopt-A-Stream Program, to encourage the removal of litter along Wests Virginia’s rivers and streams by volunteers.
Title
Requiring DEP create and implement Adopt-A-Stream Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 494) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 493) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 287) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 493) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 287) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 106, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/20/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Governor 3/20/19 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 494) |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 493) |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | To Judiciary |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 287) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 287) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Originating in Senate Natural Resources |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 15A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 15A | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |