WV SB676 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish a dedicated fund for the acquisition, construction, maintenance, and rehabilitation of roads suitable for off-road vehicle recreation. The bill also establishes a grant program with administrative provisions to review, approve, and manage applications for grants.
Title
Relating to off-road vehicle recreation
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Kenny Mann [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 551) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 550) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 288) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 288) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 550) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 288) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 288) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/19/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-19 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/19 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 551) |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 550) |
2019-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Government Organization |
2019-02-28 | House | To Government Organization |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 288) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 288) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Unanimous consent to commit bill to Rules objected to |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Beach requests to be removed as sponsor of bill |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Motion to read a first time adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Originating in Senate Natural Resources |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 2A | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1 | 12a | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1 | 18d | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 17 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 17 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 17 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 17 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 17 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |