WV SB710 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing pilot program to evaluate telemedicine health services
Title
Establishing pilot program to evaluate telemedicine health services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 309) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2020-03-06 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-27 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 309) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-18 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-05 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 14 | 12d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 14 | 12e | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 3 | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 13b | New Code | See Bill Text |