WV SB728 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting all property used for agricultural purposes from county property maintenance codes or ordinances
Title
Exempting all property used for agricultural purposes from county property maintenance codes or ordinances
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. John Pitsenbarger [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 236) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-25 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 236) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-07 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 1 | 3n | Amended Code | Citation Text |