WV SB745 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating exemption to state sales and use tax for rental and leasing of equipment
Title
Creating exemption to state sales and use tax for rental and leasing of equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 315) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 315) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 315) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 315) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 315) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-10 | Senate | To Finance |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |