WV SB758 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authority of Emergency Medical Services Advisory Council
Title
Relating to authority of Emergency Medical Services Advisory Council
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 319) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2020-02-27 | House | To Government Organization |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 319) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 4C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |