WV SB762 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Preserving Patient Stability Act of 2020
Title
Creating Preserving Patient Stability Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 320) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | To House Finance |
2020-03-02 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-27 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 320) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-02-13 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-13 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 4u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3ff | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 7u | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 8r | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8u | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 16 | 7g | New Code | See Bill Text |