WV SB778 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 18, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 18, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Supplemental appropriation of expiring funds from State Excess Lottery Revenue Fund to DHHR
Title
Supplemental appropriation expiring funds from State Excess Lottery Revenue Fund to DHHR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 408) (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 407) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 171) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 171) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 407) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 171) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 171) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 18, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/12/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/12/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/12/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/10/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/10/20 |
2020-02-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-28 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 408) |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 407) |
2020-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-28 | House | From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Do pass |
2020-02-19 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-19 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 171) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 171) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |