WV SB8 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain armed forces veterans from payment of fees for license to carry deadly weapon
Title
Exempting certain armed forces veterans from payment of fees for license to carry deadly weapon
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Eric Tarr [R] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] |
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2020-01-28 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 24) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Military |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Military then Finance |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |