WV SB841 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring Governor to fix salaries of certain appointed officers after office is vacated
Title
Requiring Governor to fix salaries of certain appointed officers after office is vacated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 333) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 333) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 333) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | To House Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | To Finance |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 333) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 333) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Originating in Senate Finance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 7 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |