WV SCR27 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Pending: House Technology and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting study determining shortage of drivers with CDLs
Title
Requesting study supply or shortage of drivers with CDLs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-03-01 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |