WV SCR29 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - To House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting DOH erect sign in Raleigh County "Birthplace of Bill Withers, noted Grammy Award- winning recording artist"
Title
Requesting DOH erect sign in Raleigh County "Home of Bill Withers"
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. Mike Green [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] |
Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. William Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | To House Rules |
2014-02-25 | House | To Rules |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-02-11 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-02-11 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |