WV SCR38 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging CSX support New River Train
Title
Urging CSX support New River Train
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | Adopted by House (Voice vote) |
2019-03-09 | House | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-09 | House | Reference dispensed |
2019-03-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-09 | House | Be adopted |
2019-02-28 | House | To House Rules |
2019-02-28 | House | To Rules |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported be communicated |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Motion |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-02-19 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |