WV SCR9 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
US Army PFC Winten L. Wayts Memorial Bridge
Title
US Army PFC Winten L. Wayts Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Mark Maynard [R] |
Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2019-03-08 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2019-03-07 | House | Be adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | To House Rules |
2019-03-05 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2019-01-25 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2019-01-25 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2019-01-15 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-01-15 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2019-01-15 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |