WY HB0017 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - President Signed HEA No. 0020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to child support; amending presumptive child support provisions; repealing provisions related to abatements; providing conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Child support amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0020 |
2018-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0020 |
2018-03-06 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0020 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | House | H02 - Appropriations:No Recommendation 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-20 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-20 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 49-10-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-13 | Bill Number Assigned |