WY HB0018 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; clarifying the hiring authority of the state board of examining water well drilling contractors and water well pump installation contractors; specifying that the budget prepared by the secretary of the board is subject to approval by the board; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Water well drillers.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2019-02-04 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0018 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/HB0018.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/HB0018.pdf |