WY HB0024 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 192
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to educators; modifying national board teacher certification incentive programs; repealing obsolete provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
National board teacher certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0024JC002: 19-9-2-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0024JC002: 35-16-9-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Concur:Failed 23-35-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Adopted HB0024JC002: 35-16-9-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - Concur:Failed 23-35-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number 192 | |
2019-03-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0120 | |
2019-02-27 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0120 |
2019-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0120 |
2019-02-27 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0120 | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members |
2019-02-21 | House | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-13 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2019-02-13 | House | Concur:Failed 23-35-2-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-02-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-06 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 36-22-2-0-0 |
2019-01-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-16 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-14 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-18 | Bill Number Assigned |