WY HB0035 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to worker's compensation; providing for payments to air ambulance service providers; allowing air ambulance service fees to be collected from injured employees; providing for assistance to injured employees; providing clarifying amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Worker's compensation-air ambulances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2019-01-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-22 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-24 | Bill Number Assigned |