WY HB0057 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to trade and commerce; making legislative findings; creating the financial technology sandbox for the testing of financial products and services in Wyoming; authorizing limited waivers of specified statutes and rules under certain conditions; establishing standards and procedures for sandbox applications, operations and supervision; authorizing reciprocity agreements with other regulators; requiring criminal history background checks; creating an account; requiring a consumer protection bond; specifying standards for the suspension and revocation of sandbox authorization; authorizing rules and orders; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Financial technology sandbox.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - Concur:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number 61 | |
2019-02-19 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0034 | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0034 |
2019-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0034 |
2019-02-14 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0034 | |
2019-02-14 | House | Concur:Passed 57-0-3-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-16 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-14 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-14 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |