WY HB0074 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to banking; making legislative findings; creating special purpose depository institutions as a new financial institution; providing that special purpose depository institutions shall be corporations; requiring that depositors be business entities; specifying compliance with applicable federal laws; establishing procedures for the incorporation, chartering and operation of special purpose depository institutions; establishing procedures for liquidation, conservatorship and voluntary dissolution; requiring a surety bond or pledged investments and specified private insurance; authorizing special purpose depository institutions to obtain federal deposit insurance; making conforming amendments; authorizing positions; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Special purpose depository institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 92 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0047 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2019-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0047 |
2019-02-19 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0047 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Concur:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-15 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 |
2019-01-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-18 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-04 | Bill Number Assigned |