WY HB0074 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to cities and towns; establishing a removal mechanism for any elected official in any form of municipal government; providing for a replacement procedure; repealing an existing recall mechanism; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Elected officials-removal.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bear [R] | Rep. Bill Fortner [R] | Rep. Chuck Gray [R] | Rep. Mark Jennings [R] |
Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Chip Neiman [R] | Sen. Troy McKeown [R] | Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - House - H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-03-12 | House | H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-01-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |