WY HB0090 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 90
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employee benefits; providing for community college police officer participation in the law enforcement plan under the Wyoming Retirement Act; authorizing election by current community college police officers; specifying implementation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Community college police officer retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Charles Pelkey [D] | Rep. William Pownall [R] | Rep. Art Washut [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] | Sen. Michael Von Flatern [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 90 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0073 | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0073 |
2019-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0073 |
2019-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0073 | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-18 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-16 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-15 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |