WY HB0094 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to construction contracts; limiting the enforceability of indemnity related provisions in construction contracts; specifying applicable law; providing exceptions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction contracts-indemnity provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateDid Not Consider for Introduction
2019-02-26 Senate Did Not Consider for Introduction
2019-01-31SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-30House3rd Reading:Passed 49-9-2-0-0
2019-01-29House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-28HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-24HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-24HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback