WY HB0098 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to rights-of-way; authorizing communications companies to install equipment within the rights-of-way of public roads; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Rights of way-communications services.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan Blake [D] | Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Rep. Cyrus Western [R] | Rep. Mike Yin [D] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - Concur:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-1-4-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-1-4-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number 138 | |
2019-02-27 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0082 | |
2019-02-25 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0082 |
2019-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0082 |
2019-02-22 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0082 | |
2019-02-22 | House | Concur:Passed 58-1-1-0-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-14 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-1-4-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-16 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |