WY HB0103 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of the government; recognizing specie as legal tender as specified; specifying that specie and specie legal tender shall not be taxed; providing that the use of specie as tender is voluntary; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Legal Tender Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - Concur:Passed 55-5-0-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Chapter No. 87 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Assigned Chapter Number 87 | |
2018-03-14 | HEA No. 0046 Became law without signature | |
2018-03-09 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0046 |
2018-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0046 |
2018-03-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0046 | |
2018-03-08 | House | Concur:Passed 55-5-0-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-14-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals 48-11-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-06 | Bill Number Assigned |